FL H1337 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides adjustment to contribution rate of reemployment assistance tax to specified employers; provides that adjustment may not be in effect during certain years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reemployment Assistance Program Law Contribution Rates

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-08HouseReferred to Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Commerce Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1339 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
S638 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
S640 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
443131Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback