FL H1337 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Chapter No. 2024-84
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Chapter No. 2024-84
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides additional authority for law enforcement officers of office of inspector general concerning department & contractor-operated correctional facilities; provides that correctional privatization contracts are not exempt from state contracting provisions unless otherwise specified; replaces term "private correctional facility" with "contractor-operated correctional facility."
Title
Department of Corrections
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Criminal Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Paula Stark [R] | Rep. Berny Jacques [R] |
Rep. Johanna Lopez [D] | Rep. Jim Mooney [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#37 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#745 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Criminal Justice Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#745 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Criminal Justice Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Chapter No. 2024-84 | |
2024-04-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-02 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-03-05 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2024-03-05 | House | In Messages |
2024-03-05 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1278 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Received |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-29 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-02-29 | House | CS passed; YEAS 110, NAYS 0 |
2024-02-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-29 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-02-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-26 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024) |
2024-02-23 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2024-02-22 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-22 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-22 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-19 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2024-01-29 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | Original reference removed: Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-26 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-01-26 | House | CS Filed |
2024-01-26 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-01-25 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-23 | House | Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-13 | House | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1278 (Same As) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1337
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
330 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 865 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 218 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 261 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 078 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
800 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0435 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 325 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 607 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 608 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 609 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 7031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 710 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 714 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 715 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 716 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 717 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 718 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 719 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 72 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 6041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
946 | 5025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
946 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
951 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
951 | 063 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
957 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
957 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
957 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
957 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
957 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
957 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
957 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
957 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
957 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
957 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
960 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 481 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 4815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |