FL H1317 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts sale of certain textbooks from sales & use tax.
Title
Exemption from Sales & Use Tax for College Textbooks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Finance and Tax Committee |
2015-03-08 | House | Referred to Finance and Tax Committee; Education Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0938 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
H7141 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
H7141 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1317 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1317/BillText/Filed/PDF |