FL H1315 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for relief of Melvin & Alma Colindres by City of Miami; provides for appropriation to compensate them for wrongful death of their son, Kevin Colindres, sustained as result of negligence of police officers of City of Miami; provides limitation on payment of fees & costs. CLAIM:
Title
Relief/Melvin and Alma Colindres/City of Miami
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-29 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 961 | |
2011-04-28 | CS by- Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 6 -HJ 894 | |
2011-04-27 | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 04/28/11, 9:00 am, Morris Hall | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee -HJ 221 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 119 | |
2011-03-07 | Filed |