FL H1285 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to propose to states an amendment to U.S. Constitution entitled "Regulation Freedom Amendment," which would require a federal regulation be adopted by majority vote of both houses of Congress if opposed by a specified percentage of membership of either house.
Title
Regulation Freedom Amendment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died on Calendar |
2014-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-11 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 7 NAYS 6 |
2014-04-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/11/14, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2014-04-03 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable by Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 10 NAYS 5 |
2014-04-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 04/03/14, 8:45 am, Webster Hall |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-03-02 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1285 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1285/BillText/Filed/PDF |