FL H1277 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that Strategic Intermodal System & Emerging Strategic Intermodal System include existing or planned corridors that are managed lanes of transit.
Title
Strategic Intermodal System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-12 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1188 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1277 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1277/BillText/Filed/PDF |