FL S1188 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying that the Strategic Intermodal System and the Emerging Strategic Intermodal System include existing or planned corridors that are managed lanes of transit, etc.
Title
Strategic Intermodal System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/13/18, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Rules |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1277 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1188 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1188/BillText/Filed/HTML |