FL H1265 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-138
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Removes certain liquor bottle size restrictions for operators of intrastate railroads & sleeping cars; removes requirement that operators of intrastate railroads & sleeping cars keep separate alcoholic beverages intended for sale on passenger trains & alcoholic beverages intended for sale in railroad transit station.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic Beverages

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#31 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#704 (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-02 Chapter No. 2018-138
2018-03-30 Approved by Governor
2018-03-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-08HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-08SenateCS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 1
2018-03-08SenateRead 3rd time 896
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-07SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-07SenateSubstituted for SB 922
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-07SenateWithdrawn from Regulated Industries; Transportation; Rules
2018-03-05SenateReceived
2018-03-05SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Transportation; Rules
2018-03-01SenateIn Messages
2018-03-01HouseCS passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 2 752
2018-03-01HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-28HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-28HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-22HouseCS by Commerce Committee read 1st time
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-22HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-22HouseCS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2018-02-20HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/22/18, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2018-01-30HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2018-01-30HouseFavorable by Careers and Competition Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2018-01-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Careers and Competition Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
2018-01-12HouseReferred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S922 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1265

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
56502Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback