FL S0922 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1265
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1265
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exception to the miniature bottle requirement for operators of intrastate railroads and sleeper cars, etc.
Title
Sale of Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1265 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 1265 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/18 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2018-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/18, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 4 NAYS 1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/13/18, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Now in Transportation |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 1 |
2018-01-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/24/18, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/23/18, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Transportation; Rules |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1265 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-138
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/922 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/922/BillText/Filed/HTML |