FL H1257 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for powers & duties of Board of Athletic Training with respect to regulation of personal trainers; creates & provides for duties of Florida Association of Fitness Examiners; provides for duties of DBPR; provides requirements for licensure by examination for personal trainers; requires that department renew license under specified circumstances; prohibits sexual misconduct in practice of personal training; provides penalties for violation of act; specifies acts that constitute violation; provides criteria for disciplinary actions; provides exemptions.
Title
Personal Trainers
Sponsors
Rep. Luis Garcia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 214 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 124 | |
2012-01-05 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1257 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1257/BillText/Filed/PDF |