FL H1249 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Family & Medical Leave Insurance Benefits Fund under DFS; requires DFS to begin collecting contributions for fund by certain date; provides CFO powers to manage revenues in fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family and Medical Leave Insurance Benefits Fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30HouseDied in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-28HouseNow in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-02-24HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1245 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
S1586 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Banking and Insurance
S1596 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce and Tourism

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
444015Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback