FL H1245 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates "Florida Family & Medical Leave Act"; requires employer to allow employees to take paid family leave to bond with minor child upon child's birth, adoption, or foster care placement; provides requirements, limitations, & duties; provides for civil action & penalties; creates family & medical leave insurance benefits program; provides duties, responsibilities, & limitations of program; prohibits specified employment practices on basis of pregnancy, childbirth, or medical condition related to pregnancy or childbirth; provides for leave, maintenance of health coverage, reasonable accommodation & transfer, & return rights for employee who is disabled from pregnancy, childbirth, or medical condition related to pregnancy or childbirth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment Practices for Family and Medical Leave

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30HouseDied in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-28HouseNow in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-02-24HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1247 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
S1596 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
H581 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
S384 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
S1586 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Banking and Insurance
H1249 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
444001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
444002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
444003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
444004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
444005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
444006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
444007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
444008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
444009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
444013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
444014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
444016Amended CodeSee Bill Text
444017Amended CodeSee Bill Text
444018Amended CodeSee Bill Text
444019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76011Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback