FL H1233 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires DEO to establish revolving loan guarantee program; provides purpose of program; requires department to contract with certain entity to administer program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minority Businesses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-17HouseReferred to Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1580 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
288715Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback