FL H1233 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died pending review of CS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to pari-mutuel wagering operating licenses, live racing requirements, transfer and conversion and relocation of permits, summer jai alai permits, tax on handle, tax credits, escheated permits, purse requirements, daily license fees & unclaimed tickets & breaks, greyhound adoption, racing days, nonwagering equine competitions, greyhound injury reporting, out-of-state races, intertrack wagering, slot machine gaming licenses, cardroom licenses & operations; provides for vote on question of authorizing destination resorts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gaming

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied pending review of CS
2015-04-21HouseCS/CS by Finance and Tax Committee read 1st time
2015-04-21HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-04-21HouseCS/CS by Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 10 NAYS 8
2015-04-20HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 04/21/15, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2015-04-14HouseNow in Finance and Tax Committee
2015-04-13HouseCS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time
2015-04-13HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-04-09HouseCS by Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 4
2015-04-07HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/09/15, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2015-03-08HouseReferred to Regulatory Affairs Committee; Finance and Tax Committee; Appropriations Committee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-03-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1235 (Related) 2015-04-28 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee
H1237 (Related) 2015-04-28 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee
H0129 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
H0187 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 239 (Ch. 2015-88)
H0239 (Similar To) 2015-06-03 - Chapter No. 2015-88
H0641 (Similar To) 2015-06-03 - Chapter No. 2015-93
H1183 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee
S0002 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Messages
S0226 (Similar To) 2015-04-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 239 (Ch. 2015-88)
S0262 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 239 (Ch. 2015-88)
S0268 (Similar To) 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 641 (Ch. 2015-93)
S7088 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1193Amended CodeSee Bill Text
110205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12080Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20165Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20222Amended CodeSee Bill Text
285710Amended CodeSee Bill Text
285712Amended CodeSee Bill Text
54610Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55001215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500235Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550054Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500555Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500651Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500745Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500951Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55009511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55009512Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55009514Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55009515Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5501155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5501625Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5501647Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5501648Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5501815Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55024055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5502415Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5502416Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5502614Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55026165Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5502625Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55026352Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5502704Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550334Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5503341Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5503345Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5503355Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5503551Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5503615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550375Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550495Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550505Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5505251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550625Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5506305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5506308Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55070Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5511045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551109Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551116Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551117Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551118Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551122Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5512065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551207Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551214Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551216Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5512165Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551217Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551218Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551219Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551222Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551223Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551225Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551227Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551228Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551230Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551231Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551404Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551406Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56120Amended CodeSee Bill Text
849086Amended CodeSee Bill Text
849095Amended CodeSee Bill Text
84915Amended CodeSee Bill Text
849161Amended CodeSee Bill Text
849231Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback