FL S0268 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 641 (Ch. 2015-93)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 641 (Ch. 2015-93)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing an amusement game or machine to be operated with specified requirements; providing requirements for classifying such a device as a Type 1 or a Type 2 amusement game or machine; providing that amusement games or machines may only be located at specified locations; requiring the Department of Revenue to annually adjust the maximum value; authorizing certain persons or entities to enjoin the operation of an amusement game or machine; providing penalties, etc.
Title
Amusement Games or Machines
Sponsors
Senate Finance and Tax Committee | Senate Regulated Industries Committee | Sen. Kelli Stargel [R] | Sen. Jack Latvala [R] |
Rep. Joseph Abruzzo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 641 (Ch. 2015-93) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 641 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/15 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 1 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/16/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2015-04-01 | Senate | CS/CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-30 | Senate | CS/CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 03/30/15, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-23 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-18 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/18/15, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-01-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 02/04/15, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0641 (Similar To) 2015-06-03 - Chapter No. 2015-93
H1233 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died pending review of CS
H1233 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died pending review of CS
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
546 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
546 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
551 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
849 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |