FL H1183 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to licensing of greyhound racing permitholders; revises provisions for fees, taxes & tax credits, intertrack wagering, greyhound adoption, charity racing days, live racing requirements, slot machine gaming areas, & cardroom licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pari-Mutuel Permitholders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Regulatory Affairs Committee
2015-03-08HouseReferred to Regulatory Affairs Committee; Appropriations Committee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1233 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died pending review of CS
S7088 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
55001215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550054Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500951Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55009514Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5501625Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5501647Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5501648Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5503551Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5506305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
849086Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback