FL H1203 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that Health Care District of Palm Beach County is subject to jurisdiction of Office of Inspector General of Palm Beach County; specifies authority of office; requires district to annually pay certain amount of its budget for preceding fiscal year to office.
Title
Palm Beach County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 213 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 118 | |
2012-01-04 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1203 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1203/BillText/Filed/PDF |