FL H1199 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for apportionment of certain taxpayer's adjusted federal income solely by sales factor; provides for eligibility based on taxpayer's capital expenditures & number of full-time employees; provides application process; authorizes DOR to examine & verify that taxpayer has correctly apportioned its taxes; conforms provisions to changes made by act; authorizes OTTED to approve & revoke approval of application; provides for recapture of unpaid taxes, interest, & penalties; authorizes office & department to adopt rules.
Title
Corporate Income Tax
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Metz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Finance and Tax Committee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 220 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 105 | |
2011-03-04 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 153 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1199 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1199/BillText/Filed/HTML |