FL H1195 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 1360
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 1360
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Abrogates repeal of provisions authorizing Governor to present Governor's Medal of Freedom to certain persons.
Title
Governor's Medal of Freedom
Sponsors
Rep. Webster Barnaby [R] | Rep. Jason Shoaf [R] | Sen. Bryan Avila [R] | Rep. Jason Fischer [R] |
Rep. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-26 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Laid on Table, refer to SB 1360 |
2022-01-26 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-01-26 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-01-26 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2022-01-20 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-01-20 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-01-18 | House | Added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-01-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1360 (Same As) 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-66
S2502 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5003
S2502 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5003