FL S2502 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5003
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5003
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Incorporating by reference certain calculations of the Florida Education Finance Program; authorizing the Board of Trustees of the University of Florida to use funds to establish the Hamilton Center for Classical and Civic Education; authorizing the Agency for Health Care Administration, in consultation with the Department of Health, to submit a budget amendment to realign funding for a component of the Children's Medical Services program to reflect actual enrollment changes; extending for 1 year the exemption of certain rules pertaining to the medical use of marijuana from certain rulemaking requirements; specifying the manner by which state funds for postsecondary workforce programs may be used for inmate education, etc.
Title
Implementing the 2022-2023 General Appropriations Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 5003 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Substituted HB 5003 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/17/22 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Filed |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/09/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
H1195 (Similar To) 2022-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 1360
H1289 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
H1291 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1000
H1471 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
H5001 (Similar To) 2022-06-03 - Chapter No. 2022-156
H5003 (Similar To) 2022-06-03 - Chapter No. 2022-157
S776 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
S1000 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Chapter No. 2022-177
S1360 (Similar To) 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-66
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
S2500 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5001
S2524 (Similar To) 2022-06-03 - Chapter No. 2022-154
H837 (Similar To) 2022-05-26 - Chapter No. 2022-137
S578 (Similar To) 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 837
H1289 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
H1291 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1000
H1471 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
H5001 (Similar To) 2022-06-03 - Chapter No. 2022-156
H5003 (Similar To) 2022-06-03 - Chapter No. 2022-157
S776 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
S1000 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Chapter No. 2022-177
S1360 (Similar To) 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-66
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
S2500 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5001
S2524 (Similar To) 2022-06-03 - Chapter No. 2022-154
H837 (Similar To) 2022-05-26 - Chapter No. 2022-137
S578 (Similar To) 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 837
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 6496 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 559 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
216 | 262 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 5304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
282 | 709 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 80125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
321 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
331 | 3101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
375 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 3071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 986 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 988 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
576 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |