FL H1193 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions of Voluntary Prekindergarten Education Program relating to provider accountability, student screening and assessments, & DOE and Office of Early Learning duties & responsibilities.
Title
Voluntary Prekindergarten Education Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-19 | House | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-03-19 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 12:00 pm, Mashburn Hall |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1594 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 59 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 63 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 67 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 68 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 69 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 75 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1193 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1193/BillText/Filed/PDF |