FL H1189 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-229
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-229
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires county health departments to participate in sexual assault response teams coordinated by certified rape crisis centers; authorizes establishment of teams by certified rape crisis centers; provides for duties & membership of sexual assault response teams; requires FL Council Against Sexual Violence to provide specified technical assistance; requires sexual assault response teams to promote & support use of sexual assault forensic examiners meeting certain requirements; requires Criminal Justice Standards & Training Commission to establish minimum standards for basic skills & continued education training programs for law enforcement officers that include specified response to sexual assault; provides requirements for courses & law enforcement officers; requires officer's certification to be placed on inactive status for failure to complete certain training.
Title
Victims of Sexual Offenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#41 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#296 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#296 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | Chapter No. 2021-229 | |
2021-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-06-28 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-26 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-26 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-26 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-26 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1530 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-04-26 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-26 | House | CS passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-23 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-20 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/23/2021) |
2021-04-20 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-04-19 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2021-04-19 | House | CS Filed |
2021-04-19 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-18 | House | PCS added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2021-04-14 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2021-04-02 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-04-02 | House | Original reference removed: Appropriations Committee |
2021-04-02 | House | Original reference removed: Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-04-01 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-04-01 | House | CS Filed |
2021-04-01 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | PCS added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-28 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1530 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1189 (Ch. 2021-229)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
154 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 1724 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |