FL S1530 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1189 (Ch. 2021-229)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1189 (Ch. 2021-229)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring counties to establish sexual assault response teams; requiring the Criminal Justice Standards and Training Commission, in consultation with the Florida Council Against Sexual Violence, to establish minimum standards for basic and advanced career development training programs for law enforcement officers that include a culturally responsive trauma-informed response to sexual assault; requiring the Criminal Justice Standards and Training Commission to incorporate a culturally responsive trauma-informed response to sexual assault into a certain course curriculum, etc.
Title
Victims of Sexual Offenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1189 (Ch. 2021-229) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 1189 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-22 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/21 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-04-21 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/21/21, 4:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/08/21, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-25 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-23 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/23/21, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1189 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-229
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
154 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 1724 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |