FL H1173 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises legislative intent that specifies retirement date of bonds issued to fund Florida Forever Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Forever Bonds

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30HouseDied in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-28HouseNow in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Ways & Means Committee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-02-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1480 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
S1510 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
H1211 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20115Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback