FL S1480 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extending the date by which bonds issued to fund the Florida Forever Act are intended to be retired, etc.
Title
Land Acquisition Trust Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/08/21, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/15/21, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1173 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
S1510 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
H1211 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
S1510 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
H1211 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee