FL H1171 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges U.S. Congress to restore & provide adequate funding for Supportive Housing for the Elderly Program.
Title
Supportive Housing for the Elderly Program
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Kerner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-03-08 | House | Referred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1426 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Rules
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1171 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1171/BillText/Filed/PDF |