FL H1165 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits posting or publishing picture of firearm, BB gun, air or gas-operated gun, or device displayed to resemble firearm to social media by minor; authorizes court to require certain adults to participate in parenting classes; provides for community service programs for violations; requires seizure of firearms; prohibits storing firearm in such way that a minor obtains access to it without permission & posts picture of it on social media.
Title
Minors Posting Firearms on Social Media
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1310 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
790 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 174 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
901 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1165 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1165/BillText/Filed/PDF |