FL H1157 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that pt. II of ch. 501, F.S., Deceptive & Unfair Trade Practice Act, applies to business of insurance; provides that rate standards for medical malpractice insurance apply to separate affiliate of insurer; requires medical malpractice liability insurer to file surcharge or discount schedule with Director of OIR before applying certain rates or surcharges; requires OIR to consider certain factors in determining insurer's rate base; requires medical malpractice insurer to provide specified information when submitting rate filing, etc.
Title
Insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 219 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 100 | |
2011-03-03 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
501 | 212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 4147 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 41495 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1157 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1157/BillText/Filed/HTML |