FL H1151 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DOH to prepare, file, & issue new certificate of live birth under specified circumstances; requires new certificate of live birth to bear specified reference & contain designation of relationship.
Title
Parentage
Sponsors
House Health Quality Subcommittee | Rep. David Richardson [D] | Rep. Jared Moskowitz [D] | Rep. Mark Pafford [D] |
Rep. Clovis Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-02-08 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | CS referred to Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2016-02-05 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-02 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-29 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 02/02/16, 1:30 pm, 306 HOB |
2016-01-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 01/25/16, 4:00 pm, 306 HOB --Temporarily postponed |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1542 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
382 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
742 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
742 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
742 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
742 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
742 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
742 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
742 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
742 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |