FL H1139 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3-2)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 426 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 426 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to Florida Development Finance Corporation, including membership & meeting requirements, annual reporting requirements, certain contracts, & bonds issued by corporation; specifies duties of regional economic development organizations; revises provisions relating to grant requirements, amounts, & eligibility; revises provisions relating to workforce services to replace CareerSource Florida, Inc., with state board or DEO; revises provisions relating to operation, purpose, requirements, structure, & authority of CareerSource Florida, Inc., & state board.
Title
Economic Development
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 426 passed |
2020-03-06 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-02-24 | House | CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-20 | House | CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/20/20, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2020-02-12 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | CS by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-02-11 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-10 | House | CS by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/10/20, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-02-04 | House | Now in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Favorable by Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 9:00 am, 12 HOB |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2020-01-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S426 (Similar To) 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-30
H5003 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-114
H1271 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
S666 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
S1244 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
H5003 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-114
H1271 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
S666 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
S1244 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1011 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 0655 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9604 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9610 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9619 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
331 | 369 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
414 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 622 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 0071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 028 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 048 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |