FL H1133 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Chapter No. 2024-192
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Chapter No. 2024-192
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires person who commits infraction that causes serious bodily injury to, or causes death of, vulnerable road user to pay specified civil penalty; requires person's driver license to be suspended for specified period; requires person to attend specified driver improvement course.
Title
Violations Against Vulnerable Road Users
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#38 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#746 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Transportation & Modals Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Criminal Justice Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#746 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Transportation & Modals Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Criminal Justice Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | Chapter No. 2024-192 | |
2024-05-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-05-07 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-03-06 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2024-03-06 | House | In Messages |
2024-03-06 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1528 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Received |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-29 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-02-29 | House | CS passed; YEAS 109, NAYS 0 |
2024-02-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-29 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-02-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-26 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024) |
2024-02-22 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2024-02-21 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-21 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-19 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2024-01-31 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Reported out of Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2024-01-31 | House | Favorable by Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | Added to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-26 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-01-26 | House | Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2024-01-26 | House | CS Filed |
2024-01-26 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-01-25 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-23 | House | Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-09 | House | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1528 (Same As) 2024-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1133
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
318 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |