FL H1127 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Chapter No. 2015-179
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Chapter No. 2015-179
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to operation or reporting of unlicensed health care clinics; revises provisions related to certain health care clinic charges or reimbursement claims; revises & provides criminal penalties for unlawful charges, operating or failing to report unlicensed clinic, filing false or misleading information related to clinic license application, & other violations; repeals provisions relating to establishment of motor vehicle insurance fraud DSO.
Title
Insurance Fraud
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#23 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#246 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#246 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Chapter No. 2015-179 | |
2015-06-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-06-11 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-24 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-24 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1306 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Criminal Justice; Appropriations |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Received |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Criminal Justice; Appropriations |
2015-04-22 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-04-22 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (413157) |
2015-04-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15 |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-04-14 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/14/15, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-04-09 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2015-04-09 | House | CS referred to Judiciary Committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-04-08 | House | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time |
2015-04-08 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-04-07 | House | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 26 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-03 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 04/07/15, 1:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2015-03-27 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-26 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2015-03-26 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-25 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-23 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/25/15, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-08 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1306 (Same As) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1127 (Ch. 2015-179)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 9905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 993 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 9935 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9891 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9894 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9895 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 736 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 3915 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |