FL S1306 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1127 (Ch. 2015-179)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1127 (Ch. 2015-179)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing provisions relating to criminal penalties applicable to unlicensed health care clinics and the reporting of unlicensed health care clinics; revising provisions related to unlawful, noncompensable, and unenforceable health care clinic charges or reimbursement claims; revising and providing criminal penalties for making unlawful charges, operating or failing to report an unlicensed clinic, filing false or misleading information related to a clinic license application, and other violations, etc.
Title
Insurance Fraud
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1127 (Ch. 2015-179) |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 1127 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-21 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-04-16 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/16/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2015-04-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/07/15, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Now in Criminal Justice |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-31 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/31/15, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Criminal Justice; Appropriations |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1127 (Same As) 2015-06-17 - Chapter No. 2015-179
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 9905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 993 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 9935 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9891 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9894 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9895 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 736 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 3915 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |