FL H1117 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certain veterinarians to practice veterinary telemedicine; provides jurisdiction of Board of Veterinary Medicine; authorizes veterinarian practicing telemedicine to order, prescribe, or make available specified medicinal drugs; prohibits such veterinarian from ordering, prescribing, or making available controlled substances unless certain conditions are met; revises grounds for disciplinary action against veterinarian; authorizes certain employees, agents, or contractors to administer rabies vaccinations; provides that supervising veterinarian assumes responsibility for any person working under veterinarian's supervision or at his or her direction; authorizes veterinarian who indirectly supervises administration of rabies vaccination to affix his or her signature stamp in lieu of actual signature on rabies vaccination certificate.
Title
Medical Treatment of Animals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#121 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Received |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2023-04-13 | Senate | In Messages |
2023-04-13 | House | Passed; YEAS 109, NAYS 0 |
2023-04-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-13 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2023-04-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-10 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/13/2023) |
2023-03-27 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-03-27 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2023-03-27 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Favorable by Commerce Committee |
2023-03-23 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2023-03-22 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-03-22 | House | Favorable by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-03-20 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-02-28 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-02-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
474 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
474 | 2021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
474 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
474 | 214 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
474 | 2165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
828 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |