FL H1117 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-177
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-177
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes district to enter into interlocal agreements, memoranda of understanding, or other agreements with local & state authorities to provide security for district facilities.
Title
Sebastian Inlet Tax District, Indian River and Brevard Counties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#54 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#690 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#690 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Chapter No. 2018-177 | |
2018-03-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-16 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2018-03-08 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2018-03-08 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Local Calendar, 03/08/18 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2018-03-01 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-03-01 | House | CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-02-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18 |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-08 | House | Favorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/08/18, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2018-01-31 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | Favorable by Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 3:30 pm, 12 HOB |
2018-01-26 | House | Now in Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee |
2018-01-25 | House | CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-01-25 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-01-24 | House | CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 01/24/18, 8:30 am, 12 HOB |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-07 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2018-01-02 | House | Filed |