FL H1107 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-19 - Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates special zone; provides boundaries & exception to general law; provides requirements for issuance of special permit for certain licensed vendors in described area for sale of alcoholic beverages for consumption off licensed premises & on public rights-of-way & public park property during city-approved special events; provides that special permits are in addition to certain other authorized temporary permits; requires bona fide licensed vendor to comply with all other statutory requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of Inverness, Citrus County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-19 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-19HouseNow in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2022-01-19HouseReported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2022-01-19HouseFavorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2022-01-14HouseAdded to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-10HouseNow in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2022-01-03HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback