FL H1097 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Chapter No. 2022-117
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Chapter No. 2022-117
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises requirements for Florida Citrus Commission membership, citrus districts, member terms, & meetings; requires certain entities to provide specified reports on citrus production research to commission; requires new varieties of citrus fruit produced from state-funded research or studies & certain technology be made exclusively available for licensing & commercialization to Department of Citrus or its designee; revises eligibility requirements of not-for-profit corporations on whose behalf Department of Citrus or DACS may collect certain financial payments.
Title
Florida Citrus
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#27 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#592 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#592 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Chapter No. 2022-117 | |
2022-05-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-05-12 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-02 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-02 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-02 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1002 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Received |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2022-02-24 | Senate | In Messages |
2022-02-24 | House | Immediately certified |
2022-02-24 | House | CS passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 0 |
2022-02-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-22 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-17 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022) |
2022-02-07 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-07 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-03 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-03 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-03 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-02 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-28 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2022-01-25 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | Reported out of Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Favorable by Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-01-21 | House | Added to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-01-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1002 (Same As) 2022-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1097
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
600 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 992 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |