FL S1002 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-13 - Now in Community Affairs
Pending: Senate Community Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as the "Citrus Recovery Act"; revising the membership of the Florida Citrus Commission; increasing the number of citrus districts in this state and revising the counties that comprise each district; requiring certain entities to provide reports on citrus production research to the commission at specified intervals and upon request of the commission; requiring that new varieties of citrus fruit produced from research or studies funded by state funds be made exclusively available for licensing and purchase to certain Florida producers for a specified timeframe, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Citrus

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-13SenateNow in Community Affairs
2022-01-13SenateFavorable by Agriculture; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2022-01-10SenateOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/13/22, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2021-12-13SenateReferred to Agriculture; Community Affairs; Rules
2021-11-19SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1097 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
600051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
60104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
60109Amended CodeSee Bill Text
60110Amended CodeSee Bill Text
60113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
60115Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback