FL H1095 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits state, political subdivisions, agencies & employees, & persons receiving state funds from assisting with entry into or resettlement in state of certain foreign refugees & immigrants; requires persons offering resettlement assistance to foreign refugees or immigrants through certain resettlement assistance programs to submit personal identifying information of such refugees & immigrants to FDLE; directs FDLE to conduct background screenings & report specified information to Governor, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, & certain persons; authorizes Governor to exercise certain powers; provides for assessment & payment of certain fees; authorizes Governor & Attorney General to challenge specified federal laws & regulations; directs Governor & Attorney General to prevent entry into or resettlement in state of certain restricted persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prevention of Acts of War

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11HouseDied on Calendar
2016-02-26HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-02-25HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 9 NAYS 6
2016-02-23HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/25/16, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
2016-02-19HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2016-02-17HouseCS/CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2016-02-17HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2016-02-16HouseCS/CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 3
2016-02-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/16/16, 9:30 am, Reed Hall
2016-02-08HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2016-02-05HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2016-02-05HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2016-02-03HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 4
2016-02-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/03/16, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2016-01-13HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2016-01-12HouseIntroduced
2016-01-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1712 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9430323Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback