FL S1712 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the state, political subdivisions, their agencies and employees, and persons receiving state funds from assisting with the entry into or resettlement in the state of certain foreign refugees and immigrants; requiring persons offering resettlement assistance to foreign refugees or immigrants through certain resettlement assistance programs to submit the personal identifying information of such refugees and immigrants to the Department of Law Enforcement, etc.
Title
Prevention of Acts of War
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1095 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1712 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1712/BillText/Filed/HTML |