FL H1077 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Chapter No. 2024-153
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Chapter No. 2024-153
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises fund into which moneys recovered by state attorneys must be remitted; revises fund into which payments received must be remitted as related to public defenders or regional counsels; revises entity that funds capital collateral regional counsel; revises list of court-related functions that clerks may fund from filing fees, service charges, court costs, & fines; revises fund into which filing fees are to be deposited; revises distribution of administrative fees; creates Clerk of Court Driver License Reinstatement Pilot Program; revises funds into which certain moneys received by state attorneys must be deposited.
Title
Clerks of Court
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#37 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#767 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Civil Justice Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#767 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Civil Justice Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Chapter No. 2024-153 | |
2024-05-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-22 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-03-06 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2024-03-06 | House | In Messages |
2024-03-06 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 1470 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Received |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-03-01 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-03-01 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 111, NAYS 0 |
2024-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-29 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-02-29 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-02-29 | House | Amendment 652249 adopted |
2024-02-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-26 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024) |
2024-02-22 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2024-02-21 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-21 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported out of Appropriations Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee |
2024-02-16 | House | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda |
2024-02-14 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Original reference removed: Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-02-13 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-13 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-13 | House | Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-13 | House | Favorable with CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-09 | House | Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-25 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-23 | House | Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-09 | House | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-12-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1470 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1077
H763 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
S950 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary
H763 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
S950 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
142 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
186 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 76 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
34 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 2101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
57 | 082 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |