FL H1067 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises procedures governing voter registration by DHSMV; provides that driver license or identification card applications, license or identification card renewal applications, & address updates for existing driver licenses or identification cards submitted to department serve as voter registration applications; specifies that applicant consents to use of his or her signature for voter registration purposes; requires specified applications to include voter registration component; specifies required content for voter registration component; provides for paper-based applications; requires supervisor of elections to provide notification of registration to each applicant; provides that applicant is registered if he or she fails to respond to notification within specified timeframe; requires supervisor to forward declinations to statewide voter registration system.
Title
Voter Registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-08 | House | Referred to Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2015-12-29 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1016 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
97 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
98 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1067 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1067/BillText/Filed/PDF |