FL S1016 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising procedures governing voter registration by the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles; providing that driver license or identification card applications, license or identification card renewal applications, and address updates for existing driver licenses or identification cards submitted to the department serve as voter registration applications; requiring specified applications to include a voter registration component, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter Registration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11SenateDied in Ethics and Elections
2016-01-12SenateIntroduced
2015-12-17SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2015-12-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1067 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
97057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98045Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback