FL H1055 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires life insurance policies or riders to provide for accelerated payment of death benefits to insureds who have been residents of nursing home for specified amount of time & who are expected to remain residents of nursing home until their death; requires insurers to offer applicants for life insurance policies or riders providing accelerated death benefit payments; requires insurers to offer by specified date riders providing accelerated death benefit payments to insureds holding policies in effect before act's effective date; requires insured who applies for Medicaid benefits in order to pay for long-term care determine fair market value of life insurance policy & spend down all proceeds from converting policy to pay for long-term care in specified manner; requires long-term care benefit plan to ensure payments are made to insured's estate & guarantee payment of funeral expense benefit to insured's estate; provides exception; authorizes OIR, in consultation with AHCA & DCFS to adopt rules; requires insurers to provide written notifications containing specified information & statements to life insurance policy owners who are of certain age or terminally or chronically ill; provides penalties & remedies under chapter 501, F.S., relating to deceptive & unfair trade practices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Life Insurance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 Died in Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee
2012-01-10 Introduced -HJ 103
2011-12-28 Referred to Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 103
2011-12-16 Filed

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback