FL H1051 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 21 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Redefines term "environmental compliance costs" to include costs or expenses prudently incurred by an electric utility in complying with specified reclaimed water reuse requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental Compliance Costs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#28 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#158 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21HouseOrdered enrolled
2021-04-21HouseIn Messages
2021-04-21SenateCS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2021-04-21SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-21SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-21SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 964
2021-04-21SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-21SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2021-04-20SenateReceived
2021-04-19SenateReferred to Rules
2021-04-15SenateIn Messages
2021-04-15HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-15HouseImmediately certified
2021-04-15HouseCS passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0
2021-04-15HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-15HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-08HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/15/2021)
2021-04-06HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-06HouseBill released to House Calendar
2021-04-06HouseReported out of Commerce Committee
2021-04-06HouseFavorable by Commerce Committee
2021-04-02HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2021-03-23HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2021-03-23HouseReported out of Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2021-03-23HouseFavorable by Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2021-03-19HouseAdded to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-12HouseNow in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2021-03-12HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-03-12HouseReferred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2021-03-10House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-03-10HouseCS Filed
2021-03-10HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-03-10HouseReported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-09HouseFavorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-05HouseAdded to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-25HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S964 (Same As) 2021-04-21 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1051

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3668255Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1051
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1051/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1051/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1051/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1051/Amendment/679643/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1051/Analyses/h1051.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1051/Analyses/h1051b.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1051/Analyses/h1051c.EAF.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1051/Analyses/h1051d.EAF.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1051/Analyses/h1051e.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1051/Analyses/h1051f.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1051/Analyses/h1051z.TIE.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1051/Vote/HouseVote_h01051c1158.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1051/Vote/SenateVote_h01051c1028.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=57749&IsPCB=0&BillId=72146
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=59130&IsPCB=0&BillId=72146
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=60077&IsPCB=0&BillId=72146

Bill Comments 750

feedback