FL H1047 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises boundaries; provides for expansion of district; authorizes district to provide fire control & emergency medical services, levy & collect taxes, assessments, & fees, & administer fire rescue programs & services within district's expanded boundaries; requires referendum.
Title
Cedar Hammock Fire Control District, Manatee County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#28 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#636 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#636 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-05-12 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-10 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-10 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-10 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Local Calendar, 03/10/22 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Received |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2022-03-02 | Senate | In Messages |
2022-03-02 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0 |
2022-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-01 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022) |
2022-02-24 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2022-02-17 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/24/2022) |
2022-02-08 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-08 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-04 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2022-01-31 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Reported out of Ways & Means Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Favorable by Ways & Means Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda |
2022-01-26 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-01-26 | House | Now in Ways & Means Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | CS Filed |
2022-01-25 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-01-25 | House | Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Favorable with CS by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-21 | House | Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-07 | House | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-12-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1049 (Related) 2022-05-16 - Approved by Governor