FL H1043 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires AHCA to select single pharmacy benefit administrator through competitive procurement process by specified date; provides contract requirements; requires agency to calculate amount equal to specified percentage of managed care organization's net underwriting gain for certain contract year & reduce organization's contract term payment by such amount.
Title
Medicaid Pharmacy Benefit Savings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-25 | House | Now in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1306 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1043 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1043/BillText/Filed/PDF |