FL H1037 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - Withdrawn from Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Policy Council; Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; Withdrawn prior to introduction -HJ 00093
Status: Introduced on February 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - Withdrawn from Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Policy Council; Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; Withdrawn prior to introduction -HJ 00093
Summary
Designates act "American & Florida Laws for Florida Courts Act"; declares choice of foreign law provisions void if foreign law would not grant parties same fundamental liberties, rights, & privileges granted under United States & Florida Constitutions, etc.
Title
Application of Foreign Law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | Withdrawn from Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Policy Council; Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; Withdrawn prior to introduction -HJ 00093 | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Policy Council; Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council | |
2010-02-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1962 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=1037&Chamber=House&Year=2010 |