FL H1005 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Economic Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HJR 1003 (Passed)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Economic Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HJR 1003 (Passed)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Waives requirement to file annual tangible personal property tax return for taxpayers who own taxable property the taxable value of which does not exceed specified amount; provides conditions & requirements for qualifying for waiver; provides application; provides appropriation. APPROPRIATION:
Title
Tangible Personal Property Taxation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Economic Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HJR 1003 (Passed) | |
2012-02-15 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 02/17/12, 8:00 am, Reed Hall --Temporarily deferred | |
2012-02-14 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 02/16/12, 11:30 am, Reed Hall --Temporarily deferred | |
2012-02-06 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 525 | |
2012-02-03 | CS by Finance and Tax Committee read 1st time -HJ 464 | |
2012-02-03 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-02-01 | CS by Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 5 -HJ 467 | |
2012-01-30 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 02/01/12, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 98 | |
2011-12-28 | Referred to Finance and Tax Committee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 98 | |
2011-12-12 | Filed |