FL H0991 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that journalist's privilege does not apply to defamation claims when defendant is professional journalist or media entity; revises provisions concerning venue for certain actions; provides for attorney fees & costs to prevailing plaintiffs in certain actions; specifies certain persons may not be considered public figures; provides certain allegations are defamatory per se; provides statutory damages to prevailing plaintiffs who are subject of such allegations; creates presumption that statement by anonymous source is presumptively false; provides public figure does not need to show actual malice to prevail in defamation action.
Title
Defamation, False Light, and Unauthorized Publication of Name or Likenesses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - House - House Civil Justice Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died in Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-14 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-14 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-14 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-10 | House | Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-02-28 | House | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H951 (Similar To) 2023-02-21 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S1220 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Rules
S1220 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
768 | 295 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
770 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
770 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
770 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
770 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
770 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
770 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
770 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
770 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
90 | 5015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |